AR SB291 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notification that SB291 is now Act 171
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notification that SB291 is now Act 171
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow The Donation Of Certain Items Including Bicycles Seized And Forfeited By Law Enforcement Agencies.
Title
To Allow The Donation Of Certain Items Including Bicycles Seized And Forfeited By Law Enforcement Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate Notification that SB291 is now Act 171 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-01 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Filed |