AR SB29 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Trafficking Fentanyl A Capital Offense; Concerning Capital Offenses; And Concerning Fentanyl Offenses.
Title
To Make Trafficking Fentanyl A Capital Offense; Concerning Capital Offenses; And Concerning Fentanyl Offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb29&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB29/SB29123120201326.pdf |