AR SB287 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB287 is now Act 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB287 is now Act 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Scholarship Requirements To Allow Certain Individuals To Be Eligible For Certain Scholarships; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Scholarship Requirements To Allow Certain Individuals To Be Eligible For Certain Scholarships; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB287 is now Act 217 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-01 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |