AR SB284 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Offense Of Capital Rape.
Title
To Create The Offense Of Capital Rape.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |