AR SB278 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that SB278 is now Act 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that SB278 is now Act 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Commerce - Arkansas Economic Development Commission Reappropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Commerce - Arkansas Economic Development Commission Reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Notification that SB278 is now Act 333 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-03-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-03-09 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |