AR SB270 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB270 is now Act 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Criminal Offense Of Sexual Indecency With A Child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Criminal Offense Of Sexual Indecency With A Child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateNotification that SB270 is now Act 619
2023-04-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-04-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-04-04SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2023-04-04SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2023-03-31SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-03-31SenateReturned from the House as passed as amended #1
2023-03-30HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-03-30HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-29HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-02SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-03-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-02SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2023-03-01SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-28SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2023-02-22SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-22SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-22SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-22SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-15SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=sb270&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270%2FSB270022220230958.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270%2FSB270022820231339.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270%2FSB270030220230915.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270%2FSB270032920231044.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=619.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270-S1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270-S2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270-S3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB270-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB270&rcs=409&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB270&rcs=761&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB270&rcs=801&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback