AR SB266 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that SB266 is now Act 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that SB266 is now Act 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Dissemination Of A Person's Criminal History Information.
Title
Concerning The Dissemination Of A Person's Criminal History Information.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Notification that SB266 is now Act 519 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |