AR SB26 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate Notification that SB26 is now Act 10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate Notification that SB26 is now Act 10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Extensions Of The Deadline For The Burning Of Storm Debris After A County Is Declared A Disaster Area.
Title
An Act To Authorize Extensions Of The Deadline For The Burning Of Storm Debris After A County Is Declared A Disaster Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate Notification that SB26 is now Act 10 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-02-03 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-02-03 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-02-03 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-26 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-20 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-01-20 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | Senate Filed |