AR SB253 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Use Of Apportionment Factors To Determine The Amount Of Partnership Income To Be Allocated To Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Use Of Apportionment Factors To Determine The Amount Of Partnership Income To Be Allocated To Arkansas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-02-25SenateWithdrawn by author.
2013-02-25SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2013-02-20SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-02-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback