AR SB25 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-29 - Notification that SB25 is now Act 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Aeronautics Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Aeronautics Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-29SenateNotification that SB25 is now Act 15
2015-01-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-01-26SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-01-26SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-01-26SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-01-26HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-01-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2015-01-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-01-22SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-01-22SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2015-01-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback