AR SB242 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that SB242 is now Act 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that SB242 is now Act 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Various Sections Of Title 24 Retirement And Pensions Regarding Members Of The Arkansas National Guard Called Into State Active Duty.
Title
To Amend Various Sections Of Title 24 Retirement And Pensions Regarding Members Of The Arkansas National Guard Called Into State Active Duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notification that SB242 is now Act 474 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2019-03-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |