AR SB237 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Preparation Of A Racial Impact Statement For Certain Bills Filed With The Senate And The House Of Representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Preparation Of A Racial Impact Statement For Certain Bills Filed With The Senate And The House Of Representatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-05-01SenateDied in House at Sine Die adjournment.
2017-03-31HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-29HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-16HouseRe-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-03-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-01SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback