AR SB235 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Technical And Vocational Education; And To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Alternate Retirement Plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Technical And Vocational Education; And To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Alternate Retirement Plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-31SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-31SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-31HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-23SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-23SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2021-01-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback