AR SB226 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Notification that SB226 is now Act 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Notification that SB226 is now Act 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Income Tax Credit Allowed For Donations Or Sales Of Machinery And Equipment To Certain Educational Institutions.
Title
To Amend The Income Tax Credit Allowed For Donations Or Sales Of Machinery And Equipment To Certain Educational Institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Notification that SB226 is now Act 203 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-02-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |