AR SB222 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that SB222 is now Act 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that SB222 is now Act 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Participation In The Local Police And Fire Deferred Retirement Option Plan.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Participation In The Local Police And Fire Deferred Retirement Option Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Notification that SB222 is now Act 608 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |