AR SB22 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Notification that SB22 is now Act 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Notification that SB22 is now Act 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Deadline For Conducting Logic And Accuracy Testing For Runoff Elections.
Title
To Amend The Deadline For Conducting Logic And Accuracy Testing For Runoff Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Notification that SB22 is now Act 164 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-01-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Filed |