AR SB217 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-19 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-19 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify, Create Accountability And Uniformity For, And Simplify Absentee Ballot Processes; To Encourage And Assist Law Enforcement Investigation Of Voter Fraud; And To Amend Election Law Concerning Absentee Ballots.
Title
An Act To Clarify, Create Accountability And Uniformity For, And Simplify Absentee Ballot Processes; To Encourage And Assist Law Enforcement Investigation Of Voter Fraud; And To Amend Election Law Concerning Absentee Ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |