AR SB214 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Notification that SB214 is now Act 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Notification that SB214 is now Act 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas State University Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas State University Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Notification that SB214 is now Act 105 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |