AR SB21 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that SB21 is now Act 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that SB21 is now Act 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Exclude Mill Scale And Slag From The Definition Of “solid Waste” In The Arkansas Solid Waste Management Act And The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund Act; And To Add A Definition For "mill Scale And Slag".
Title
To Exclude Mill Scale And Slag From The Definition Of “solid Waste” In The Arkansas Solid Waste Management Act And The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund Act; And To Add A Definition For "mill Scale And Slag".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Notification that SB21 is now Act 74 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed |