AR SB21 | 2020 | 92nd General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Notification that SB21 is now Act 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Arkansas Geographic Information Systems Office Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Arkansas Geographic Information Systems Office Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24SenateNotification that SB21 is now Act 118
2020-04-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2020-04-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2020-04-16SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2020-04-16SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2020-04-16HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2020-04-16HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2020-04-16HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2020-04-16HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2020-04-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2020-04-15HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2020-04-15SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2020-04-15SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2020-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2020-04-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2020-04-01SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback