AR SB21 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB21 is now Act 1393
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Revenue Classification Law Of Arkansas; And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Revenue Classification Law Of Arkansas; And For Other Purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB21 is now Act 1393
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-18SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-18HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-17HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-17SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-17SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-16SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-01-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback