AR SB20 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Notification that SB20 is now Act 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Career Education Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Career Education Reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09SenateNotification that SB20 is now Act 223
2016-05-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2016-05-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2016-05-04SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2016-05-04SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2016-05-04HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2016-05-04HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-04HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-05-04HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-05-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2016-05-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2016-05-03SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2016-05-03SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2016-04-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2016-03-17SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback