AR SB2 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - Returned to Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Education - Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Education - Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-10-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-21HouseReturned to Senate.
2013-10-19SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-10-19SenateDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-10-19HouseDied on House calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-10-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-10-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-10-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-10-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-10-18SenateORDERED ENGROSSED
2013-10-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-10-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-10-18SenateRules suspended.
2013-10-18SenateAmendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted
2013-10-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-10-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-10-17SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback