AR SB181 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Notification that SB181 is now Act 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Notification that SB181 is now Act 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate Foundation Repair Contracts.
Title
To Regulate Foundation Repair Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Notification that SB181 is now Act 687 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |