AR SB18 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that SB18 is now Act 604
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that SB18 is now Act 604
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Child Custody And Visitation.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Child Custody And Visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notification that SB18 is now Act 604 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed |