AR SB178 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | The vote by which SB178 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |