AR SB174 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB174 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB174 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Termination Of Active Membership Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And Amending The Definition Of "normal Retirement Age".
Title
Concerning The Termination Of Active Membership Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And Amending The Definition Of "normal Retirement Age".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Notification that SB174 is now Act 290 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2021-02-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |