AR SB174 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB174 is now Act 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Mandatory Electronic Prescribing For Controlled Substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Mandatory Electronic Prescribing For Controlled Substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateNotification that SB174 is now Act 447
2019-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-18SenateThe vote by which SB174 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-02-18SenateEXPUNGED
2019-02-18SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-02-14SenateMotion to refer SB174 to PUBLIC HEALTH - SENATE failed
2019-02-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-14SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-02-05SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback