AR SB173 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB173 is now Act 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB173 is now Act 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Definition Of "critical Infrastructure" In Regards To The Offense Of Unlawful Use Of An Unmanned Aircraft System.
Title
Concerning The Definition Of "critical Infrastructure" In Regards To The Offense Of Unlawful Use Of An Unmanned Aircraft System.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. John Maddox [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Notification that SB173 is now Act 140 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |