AR SB171 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Definition Of Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists By Removing Supervision Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Definition Of Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists By Removing Supervision Requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-03-31SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-03-31SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2017-02-14SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-02-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-14SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback