AR SB169 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB169 is now Act 256
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB169 is now Act 256
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Outdoor Sales Of Nonalcoholic Beverages By A Minor.
Title
Concerning Outdoor Sales Of Nonalcoholic Beverages By A Minor.
Sponsors
Sen. Trent Garner [R] | Rep. David Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Notification that SB169 is now Act 256 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |