AR SB164 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB164 is now Act 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB164 is now Act 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Licensure Of Certain Professions Licensed By The Arkansas Board Of Examiners In Counseling.
Title
To Amend The Licensure Of Certain Professions Licensed By The Arkansas Board Of Examiners In Counseling.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB164 is now Act 370 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | Senate | ORDERED ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |