AR SB154 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Notification that SB154 is now Act 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Notification that SB154 is now Act 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Improve The Safety Of Highways And Roads By Prohibiting Wireless Telephone Use In School Zones And Highway Work Zones.
Title
To Improve The Safety Of Highways And Roads By Prohibiting Wireless Telephone Use In School Zones And Highway Work Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate Notification that SB154 is now Act 37 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-02-15 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-02-15 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-02-15 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-02-15 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-08 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Public Transportation | |
2011-02-02 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Filed |