AR SB149 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB149 is now Act 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Fair Mortgage Lending Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Fair Mortgage Lending Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateNotification that SB149 is now Act 531
2021-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-30SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-29SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-29SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-29HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-03-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-03-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback