AR SB148 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB148 is now Act 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB148 is now Act 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Related To The Recording Of Coordinates Based On The Arkansas Coordinate System 1983; And To Repeal The Proximity-to-station Requirement.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Related To The Recording Of Coordinates Based On The Arkansas Coordinate System 1983; And To Repeal The Proximity-to-station Requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB148 is now Act 157 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed |