AR SB14 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 3rd Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Notification that SB14 is now Act 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Public School And School District Accountability System; To Provide A Pause In Current State Accountability Classifications; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Public School And School District Accountability System; To Provide A Pause In Current State Accountability Classifications; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24SenateNotification that SB14 is now Act 20
2016-05-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2016-05-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2016-05-23SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2016-05-23SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2016-05-23HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2016-05-23HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-05-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-05-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2016-05-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2016-05-20SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2016-05-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2016-05-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback