AR SB136 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB136 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB136 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify Gas Rates To Determine The Lowest Or Most Advantageous Market For Pipeline Companies.
Title
To Modify Gas Rates To Determine The Lowest Or Most Advantageous Market For Pipeline Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB136 is now Act 156 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |