AR SB136 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Notification that SB136 is now Act 271
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Notification that SB136 is now Act 271
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.
Title
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Senate Notification that SB136 is now Act 271 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2012-03-02 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2012-03-02 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2012-03-02 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2012-03-02 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-29 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2012-02-29 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Filed |