AR SB132 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Notification that SB132 is now Act 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating The Commission For Parent Counsel; Concerning Dependency-neglect Representation For The Parent Of A Minor Child; And Concerning Representation In The Juvenile Division Of Circuit Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating The Commission For Parent Counsel; Concerning Dependency-neglect Representation For The Parent Of A Minor Child; And Concerning Representation In The Juvenile Division Of Circuit Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateNotification that SB132 is now Act 861
2017-03-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-03-29SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-03-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-03-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-02-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-16SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-15SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2017-02-07SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-07SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-24SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-24SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-24SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-17SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback