AR SB130 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that SB130 is now Act 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that SB130 is now Act 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program - Part 1.
Title
To Repeal The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program - Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Notification that SB130 is now Act 81 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |