AR SB127 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB127 is now Act 558
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB127 is now Act 558
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That Employers In The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System Must Make Contributions For Both Active And Retired Members Who Have Returned To Work.
Title
To Provide That Employers In The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System Must Make Contributions For Both Active And Retired Members Who Have Returned To Work.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Key [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Notification that SB127 is now Act 558 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT | |
2011-03-15 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs | |
2011-02-21 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Filed |