AR SB122 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB122 is now Act 1397
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #8) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Higher Education Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Higher Education Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB122 is now Act 1397
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-19SenateHouse amendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and concurred in.
2013-04-19SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-18SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-18HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-18HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-04-18HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2013-04-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-17HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-17SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-17SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-17SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-17SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-17SenateAmendment # 6 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 6
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-08SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-08SenateAmendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5
2013-04-08SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-05SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-05SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
2013-04-05SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-04SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-04SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2013-04-04SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-03-28SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-03-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-28SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2013-03-28SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-02-14SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-02-14SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-02-14SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-01-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-01-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback