AR SB1146 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1146 is now Act 1195
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish A Pilot Program For School Districts To Obtain Compressed Natural Gas School Buses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish A Pilot Program For School Districts To Obtain Compressed Natural Gas School Buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-12SenateNotification that SB1146 is now Act 1195
2013-04-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-10SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-10HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback