AR SB111 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that SB111 is now Act 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Parks And Tourism Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Parks And Tourism Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateNotification that SB111 is now Act 721
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-29HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-29HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-02-25SenateRe-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback