AR SB1091 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1091 is now Act 1427
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1091 is now Act 1427
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Disposition Of Revenues Generated By The Ad Valorem Tax Assessed On Certain Utilities And Carriers.
Title
To Amend The Disposition Of Revenues Generated By The Ad Valorem Tax Assessed On Certain Utilities And Carriers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB1091 is now Act 1427 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |