AR SB1042 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1042 is now Act 1288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1042 is now Act 1288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Prison Overcrowding; Concerning Parole And Parole Eligibility And Procedures; Concerning Criminal Justice And Public Safety; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning Prison Overcrowding; Concerning Parole And Parole Eligibility And Procedures; Concerning Criminal Justice And Public Safety; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB1042 is now Act 1288 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 WITHDRAWN |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |