AR SB1039 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1039 is now Act 1287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1039 is now Act 1287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Conflict Of Interest Provisions For Members And Former Members Of Certain State Entities.
Title
To Provide Conflict Of Interest Provisions For Members And Former Members Of Certain State Entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB1039 is now Act 1287 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |