AR SB1 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly Appropriation For The 2021 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly Appropriation For The 2021 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-14 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 3 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-01-13 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-01-13 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-01-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-01-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |