AR SB1 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-first General Assembly Appropriation For The 2017 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-first General Assembly Appropriation For The 2017 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 2 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-01-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-01-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-01-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-01-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Filed |