AR SB1 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly 2nd Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateNotification that SB1 is now Act 5
2014-07-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2014-07-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2014-07-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2014-07-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2014-07-02HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2014-07-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-07-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2014-07-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2014-07-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2014-07-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2014-07-01SenateOrdered Engrossed
2014-07-01SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-07-01SenateRules suspended.
2014-07-01SenateAmendment 1 read the 1st time, rules suspended, read the 2nd time and adopted
2014-07-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2014-06-30SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2014-06-30SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2014-06-30SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback